EP0283900 - Water soluble azo compounds, process for their preparation and their use as dyestuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1992 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Springer, Hartmut, Dr. Am Erdbeerstein 27 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Hussong, Kurt, Dr. Am Flachsland 56 D-6233 Kelkheim/Taunus / DE | [1988/39] | Application number, filing date | 88104058.8 | 15.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | DE19873708767 | 18.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3708767 | [1988/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0283900 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283900 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/51, D06P1/384, C07D249/18, C07C317/14 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
C09B62/51 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/39] | C09B62/51, D06P1/384, C07D249/18, C07C147/12 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/39] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Azoverbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Farbstoffe | [1991/15] | English: | Water soluble azo compounds, process for their preparation and their use as dyestuffs | [1988/39] | French: | Composés azoiques solubles dans l'eau, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation comme colorants | [1988/39] |
Former [1988/39] | Wasserlöschliche Azoverbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Farbstoffe | Examination procedure | 29.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 12.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]DE3625386 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |