EP0289754 - Control lever arrangement for the automatic transmission of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1988 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.1989 [1989/02] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
DE
IT
NL
SE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | For:ES
FORD MOTOR COMPANY Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For:BE
DE
IT
NL
SE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | ||
For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:ES
FORD MOTOR COMPANY One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, Greame Heckhaus 23 D-5203 Much / DE | 02 /
De Crouppé Guido Königsberger Strasse 4 D-5020 Frechen 5 / DE | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Ritzkowsky, Harald Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Ritzkowsky, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 D-50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104130.5 | 16.03.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | DE19873714285 | 29.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3714285 | [1988/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289754 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60K20/04, F16F1/38 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
F16F1/387 (EP);
F16H59/10 (EP);
G05G1/04 (EP);
F16H59/0208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Wählhebelanordnung für ein Kraftfahrzeug-Automatik-Getriebe | [1988/45] | English: | Control lever arrangement for the automatic transmission of a motor vehicle | [1988/45] | French: | Agencement d'un levier de commande pour transmission automatique d'un véhicule automobile | [1988/45] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2348077 ; | [Y]GB863720 ; | [AD]DE3519868 |