EP0319637 - Magnetic theft or intrusion security system and suitable metallic sensor element therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KARL HARMS HANDELS-GMBH & CO. KG St.-Annen-Strasse 17-21 26441 Jever / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states KARL HARMS HANDELS-GMBH & CO. KG St.-Annen-Strasse 17-21 D-26441 Jever / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Erhard Jadestrasse 10 D-2893 Butjadingen 1 / DE | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, et al Jabbusch Arendt & Siekmann Koppelstrasse 3 26135 Oldenburg / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, Dr.Jur. Jabbusch, Wehser & Lauerwald Patentanwälte, et al Koppelstrasse 3 D-26135 Oldenburg / DE | ||
Former [1994/21] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, Dr.Jur. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dr.Jur. W. Jabbusch Dipl.-Phys. J. Lauerwald Koppelstrasse 3 D-26135 Oldenburg / DE | ||
Former [1994/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1989/24] | Hoormann, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104515.7 | 22.03.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | DE19873741780 | 10.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3741780 | [1989/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0319637 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0319637 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319637 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
G08B13/2408 (EP,US);
G08B13/2474 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Diebstahl- bzw. Einbruch-Sicherungssystem sowie hierfür geeignetes Sensor-Metallelement | [1989/24] | English: | Magnetic theft or intrusion security system and suitable metallic sensor element therefor | [1989/24] | French: | Système de sécurité magnétique contre le vol, respectivement contre l'intrusion ainsi que capteur-élément de métal approprié à cet effet | [1989/24] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 03.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2143326 (WIEGAND J); | [X]US3747086 (PETERSON G); | [A]US3938125 (BENASSI DOMINIC A); | [A]US4151405 (PETERSON GLEN [US]); | [A]US4247601 (WIEGAND JOHN R); | [A]EP0170854 (KNOGO CORP [US]); | [A]GB2167627 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP) |