EP0291660 - Atomic absorption spectrophotometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Katsuhito 697-9, Horiguchi Katsuta-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Moriya Kazuo 4829-33, Nakane Katsuta-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Iwata, Hiroji 663, Ichige Katsuta-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/47] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104560.3 | 22.03.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | JP19870089152 | 11.04.1987 Original published format: JP 8915287 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291660 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291660 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/31, G01J3/42 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
G01N21/3103 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/47] | G01N21/31 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/47] | Title | German: | Atomabsorptionsspektrophotometer | [1988/47] | English: | Atomic absorption spectrophotometer | [1988/47] | French: | Spectrophotomètre d'absorption atomique | [1988/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 15.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4341470 ; | [A]DE1648863 ; | [A]US4195932 |