EP0296316 - 1,4-Dihydropyridine enantiomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 D-78403 Konstanz / DE | [1988/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amschler, Hermann, Dr. Hohenhewenstrasse 19 D-7760 Radolfzell / DE | 02 /
Eistetter, Klaus, Dr. Säntisblick 7 D-7750 Konstanz 19 / DE | 03 /
Eltze, Manfrid, Dr. Schützenstrasse 20 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | 04 /
Flockerzi, Dieter, Dr. Ackerweg 26 D-7753 Allensbach / DE | 05 /
Klemm, Kurt, Prof. Dr. Im Weinberg 2 D-7753 Allensbach / DE | 06 /
Kohl, Bernhard, Dr. Heinrich-v.-Tettingen-Strasse 35a D-7750 Konstanz / DE | 07 /
Kolassa, Norbert, Prof. Dr. Lerchenweg 12 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | 08 /
Sanders, Karl, Dr. Felchengang 12 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | 09 /
Schudt, Christian, Dr. Hoheneggstrasse 112 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | 10 /
Ulrich, Wolf-Rüdiger, Dr. Hebelstrasse 3 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | [1988/52] | Application number, filing date | 88104691.6 | 24.03.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | CH19870001190 | 27.03.1987 Original published format: CH 119087 | CH19870001184 | 27.03.1987 Original published format: CH 118487 | [1988/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296316 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296316 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/90, C07D401/04, C07D405/04, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, A61K31/44 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D211/90 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/35] |
Former [1988/52] | ES, GR | Title | German: | 1,4-Dihydropyridin-Enantiomere | [1993/35] | English: | 1,4-Dihydropyridine enantiomers | [1988/52] | French: | Enantiomères de dihydro-1,4-pyridine | [1988/52] |
Former [1988/52] | 1,4-Dihydropyridine-Enantiomere | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/36: Verbunden mit 88903212.4/0343193 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 18.07.90 | EPB 1990/36: Consolidated with 88903212.4/0343193 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 18.07.90 | EPB 1990/36: Jointe à la demande no. 88903212.4/0343193 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 18.07.90 | Examination procedure | 08.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 25.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Request for further processing for: | 09.07.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2142021 (SANDOZ LTD); | [Y]WO8603748 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]); | [Y]EP0176956 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]); | [Y]EP0174653 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y]DE3627742 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]); | [XP]EP0242829 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]); | [XP]EP0240828 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]); | [XP]EP0244595 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]) | Examination | EP0172509 | - Progress in Pharmacology, vol. 5/1, 1982, Seite 25 |