EP0287831 - Transport aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung D-81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rössner, Bernd Lärchenweg 2 D-2107 Rosengarten 6 / DE | 02 /
Sprenger, Wilfried Buentfeld 21 D-2165 Issendorf / DE | [1988/43] | Application number, filing date | 88104697.3 | 24.03.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | DE19873713466 | 22.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3713466 | [1988/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0287831 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B64D25/00, B64C1/40 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
B64C1/066 (EP);
B64D25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1988/43] | Title | German: | Transportflugzeug | [1988/43] | English: | Transport aircraft | [1988/43] | French: | Avion de transport | [1988/43] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 06.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4121790 ; | [X]WO8404727 ; | [A]WO8503032 |