EP0284077 - Process and device for determining linear deformations in an electro acoustic transfer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.09.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scherer, Gertrud Hundertsweg 16 D-5100 Aachen / DE | For all designated states Scherer, Andreas Hundertsweg 16 D-5100 Aachen / DE | For all designated states Scherer, Karl Joachim Dietmar Hundertsweg 16 D-5100 Aachen / DE | For all designated states Scherer, Peter (vertreten durch Scherer, Gertrud) Hundertsweg 16 D-5100 Aachen / DE | [1990/34] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states Scherer, Paul, Dr.-Ing. Hundertsweg 16 D-5100 Aachen-Friesenrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB ALPHA-Haus Garmischer Strasse 35 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104769.0 | 24.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | DE19873709556 | 24.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3709556 | [1988/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0284077 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04R29/00 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
G01H3/005 (EP);
H04R29/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der linearen Verzerrungen einer elektroakustischen Übertragungsstrecke | [1988/39] | English: | Process and device for determining linear deformations in an electro acoustic transfer system | [1988/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la détermination de déformations d'une chaîne électro-acoustique | [1988/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 26.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/46] | 25.06.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3922506 ; | [AD]DE2837130 | [A] - JOURNAL OF AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, Band 28, Nr. 4, April 1980, Seiten 250-258, New York, US; S. LINKWITZ: "Shaped tone-burst testing" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, Band 33, Nr. 1/2, Januar-Februar 1985, Seiten 2-32, New York, US; F.E. TOOLE: "Subjective measurements of loudspeaker sound quality and listener performance" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, Band 33, Nr. 1/2, Januar-Februar 1985, Seiten 33-53, New York, US; A. GABRIELSSON et al.: "Perceived sound quality of high-fidelity loudspeakers" |