EP0285925 - Sealing profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states METZELER Automotive Profiles GmbH Bregenzer Strasse 133 D-88131 Lindau / DE | ||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | |||
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states METZELER Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-80992 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | |||
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states METZELER Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-80992 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 D-80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brachmann, Walter Conrad-Forsterstrasse 72 D-8993 Nonnenhorn / DE | 02 /
Leistner, Rolf Rambertsweg 13 D-8000 München 50 / DE | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Dexheimer, Rolf Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, Patentabteilung AJ-3 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Dexheimer, Rolf Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/40] | Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Seibert + Michelis Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/41] | Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104789.8 | 25.03.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | DE19873712149 | 10.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3712149 | DE19883801073 | 15.01.1988 Original published format: DE 3801073 | [1988/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285925 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285925 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285925 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0285925 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/22, B60R13/06 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
B60J10/16 (EP);
B60J10/18 (EP);
B60J10/24 (EP);
B60J10/265 (EP);
B60J10/30 (EP);
B60J10/75 (EP);
B60J10/79 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/41] | E06B7/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Dichtungsprofil | [1988/41] | English: | Sealing profile | [1988/41] | French: | Profil d'étanchéité | [1988/41] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 16.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.1992
04.06.1992
ADMISSIBLE Schlegel GmbH Bredowstrasse 33 D-22113 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Niebuhr, Heinrich, et al, et al Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.1992
04.06.1992
ADMISSIBLE Schlegel GmbH Bredowstrasse 33 D-22113 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Niebuhr, Heinrich, et al, et al Rothenbaumchaussee 58 D-20148 Hamburg / DE | 16.10.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.02.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.04.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.06.1993 | Appeal received No. T0538/93 | 10.08.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.09.1994 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1994/39] | 05.04.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/14] | 22.01.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 26.03.1995 | ES | 27.03.1995 | [2004/37] |
Former [1996/04] | SE | 26.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3016263 (ELLER TORE GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE2945836 ; | [X]FR2128709 (DRAFTEX GMBH); | [X]DE2127097 ; | [X]DE576672 (JAMES SIMS REID); | [X]DE572409 (JAMES SIMS REID); | [A]GB640966 (BECKETT LAYCOCK & WATKINSON); | [A]FR2435644 (DRAFTEX DEV AG [CH]) |