EP0287850 - Sensor for measuring the flow of a liquid in a conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WALTER BECK GMBH & CO. KG Maybachstrasse 11 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1988/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Walter Heckenweg 5 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Burgbacher, Axel Rübezahlweg 14 D-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104936.5 | 26.03.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | DE19873712023 | 09.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3712023 | [1988/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0287850 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287850 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0287850 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/22 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
G01F1/28 (EP);
G01F1/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/43] | Title | German: | Sensor zur Erfassung der Strömung einer Flüssigkeit in einer Rohrleitung | [1988/43] | English: | Sensor for measuring the flow of a liquid in a conduit | [1988/43] | French: | Palpeur pour détecter l'écoulement dans un conduit | [1988/43] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 18.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0026715 [ ] (BENDIX CORP [US]); | DE3428373 [ ] (WESP JOACHIM); | DE3344757 [ ] (REGAST REGELUNG AUTOMATION STE [DE]); | GB1460594 [ ] (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) |