EP0285147 - Current-carrying lead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | Change - classification | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | 08.05.1998 | Change - classification | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | 08.05.1998 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Itami Research Laboratories, 1-1, Koya-Kita 1-chome Itami, Hyogo 664 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzawa, Chizuru c/o Osaka Works Sumimoto Electric Ind. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [1989/04] |
Former [1988/40] | 01 /
Sugawa, Chizuru c/o Osaka Works Sumimoto Electric Ind. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/40] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105209.6 | 30.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | JP19870080401 | 31.03.1987 Original published format: JP 8040187 | JP19870080408 | 31.03.1987 Original published format: JP 8040887 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285147 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285147 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285147 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0285147 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01F6/00, H01B12/06 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
H01B12/02 (EP,US);
H10N60/81 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US);
Y10S505/885 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/48] | H01F7/22, H01B12/06 | ||
Former IPC [1988/40] | H01B12/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/40] | Title | German: | Stromführende Leitung | [1988/40] | English: | Current-carrying lead | [1988/40] | French: | Conduite transporteuse de courant | [1988/40] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1993
10.02.1994
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1993
10.02.1994
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 15.02.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.06.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.08.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.03.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61168530 ; | [A]US3317651 (SERGE DEINESS); | [A]US3412320 (MARSHALL HARRY L); | [A]FR1548640 ; | [Y]US3828111 (BERTHET M); | [A]GB1404682 (OXFORD INSTR CO LTD); | [A]DE2451949 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 373 (C-391)(2430) 12 December 1986, & JP-A-61 168 530 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP |