EP0286950 - Feed chutes for fibre-processing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.07.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schenkel, Thomas Rebenstrasse 3 CH-8307 Effretikon / CH | 02 /
Stähli, Urs Tösstalstrasse 62 CH-8488 Turbenthal / CH | [1988/42] | Application number, filing date | 88105423.3 | 06.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | CH19870001455 | 13.04.1987 Original published format: CH 145587 | [1988/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286950 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0286950 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D01G23/02 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
D01G23/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/42] | Title | German: | Fuellschächte für faserverarbeitende Maschinen | [1988/42] | English: | Feed chutes for fibre-processing machines | [1988/42] | French: | Cheminée d'alimentation pour machines de traitement de matière fibreuse | [1988/42] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 16.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.1992
22.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92 Postfach 30 04 54 D-41194 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1992/42] | 04.09.1992 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 25.09.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.01.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.01.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 09.02.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.03.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.03.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/37] | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.04.1993 | FR | 29.12.1993 | [2004/38] |
Former [1995/03] | CH | 27.11.1991 | |
LI | 27.11.1991 | ||
FR | 29.12.1993 | ||
Former [1995/02] | FR | 29.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB973662 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN); | [A]FR1405043 (VSESOIUZNY NAUTCHNO I I TEXTIL); | [A]DE2050111 ; | [X]FR2524500 (TRUETZSCHLER & CO [DE]); | [A]US4593436 (BURGESS W D [US], et al) |