EP0294553 - Cell which can be activated by the use of lithium/thionyl chloride or lithium/sulfuril chloride couples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFT (inscrite au Registre du Commerce sous le numéro 343 588 737) 156 avenue de Metz 93230 Romainville / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states SAFT (inscrite au Registre du Commerce sous le numéro 343 588 737) 156 avenue de Metz F-93230 Romainville / FR | ||
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states Société Anonyme dite SAFT 156, avenue de Metz F-93230 Romainville / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Descroix, Jean-Pierre 16bis, rue de Neuilly F-94120 Fontenay sous Bois / FR | 02 /
Leben, Yannick 10, rue Albert Laurenson F-93000 Bobigny / FR | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105461.3 | 06.04.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | FR19870005203 | 13.04.1987 Original published format: FR 8705203 | [1988/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294553 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294553 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/32 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
H01M6/32 (EP,US);
H01M6/50 (EP,US);
H01M50/618 (EP,US);
H01M50/673 (EP,US);
H01M6/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/50] | Title | German: | Aktivierbare Lithium/Thionylchlorid- oder Lithium/Sulfurylchlorid-Zelle | [1988/50] | English: | Cell which can be activated by the use of lithium/thionyl chloride or lithium/sulfuril chloride couples | [1988/50] | French: | Pile amorçable mettant en oeuvre les couples lithium/chlorure de thionyle ou lithium/chlorure de sulfuryle | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57103271 ; | [A]US3713413 (NAKAMURA R); | [A]FR2270685 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]); | [A]US4200684 (BRO PER [US]); | [A]WO8402428 (GOULD INC [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 189 (E-133)[1067], 28 septembre 1982; & JP-A-57 103 271 (YUASA DENCHI K.K.) 26-06-1982, & JP57103271 A 00000000 |