EP0286967 - Process and device for reducing nitrogen oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1989 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Held, Wolfgang, Dr. Wilhelmstrasse 1 D-3180 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
König, Axel, Dr. Galgenkamp 13 D-3180 Wolfsburg / DE | 03 /
Puppe, Lothar, Dr. Am Weiher 10a D-5093 Burscheid / DE | [1988/42] | Application number, filing date | 88105499.3 | 07.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | DE19873713169 | 17.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3713169 | [1988/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0286967 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0286967 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
B01D53/9413 (EP);
F01N3/20 (EP);
F01N3/2033 (EP);
F01N3/36 (EP);
F01N2370/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reduktion von Stickoxiden | [1988/42] | English: | Process and device for reducing nitrogen oxides | [1988/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la réduction d'oxydes d'azote | [1988/42] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 07.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 13.03.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]DE3642018 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]EP0217480 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [A]JPS60156548 | [A] - IND. ENG. CHEM. PROD. RES. DEV. Band 18, Nr. 4, 1979, Seiten 279-283, Washington USA; T. SEIYAMA et al. "Symposium on Surface Science of Catalysis: Surface Intermediates""Catalytic Reduction of NO with NH3 over CU(II) NaY" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 324 (C-320)(2047)Dezember 1985; & JP-A-60 156 548 (TOYO SODA KOGYO K.K) 16-08-1985 |