EP0290783 - Fastening of an end plate to the rotor blade of a turbo machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1988/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fried, Reinhard Stockackerstrasse 1 CH-5415 Nussbaumen / CH | [1988/46] | Application number, filing date | 88105523.0 | 07.04.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | CH19870001419 | 13.04.1987 Original published format: CH 141987 | [1988/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290783 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290783 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/22, F16B3/04 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
F16B3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Befestigung einer Deckplatte an dem Blatt einer Turbomaschinenschaufel | [1988/46] | English: | Fastening of an end plate to the rotor blade of a turbo machine | [1988/46] | French: | Fixation d'une plaque terminale sur l'aile d'une aube de rotor pour turbomachines | [1988/46] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 17.07.1991 | FR | 06.12.1991 | [1992/25] |
Former [1992/10] | SE | 17.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE145116 ; | [A]GB173803 (GEORGE WILSON, et al); | [A]US1423466 (EDWIN SNYDER JOHN); | [A]US2445154 (REED ROBERT H); | [A]DE838670 (DINGLER WERKE AG); | [A]FR1332988 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]US3666302 (KELIETT ERIC) |