EP0286100 - Process and plant for the treatment and anaerobic digestion of biogenic wastes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/41] | Process and plant for the treatment and anaerobic conversion of organic waste | ||
[1991/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REA GESELLSCHAFT FÜR RECYCLING VON ENERGIE UND ABFALL MBH Rottmannstrasse 18 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states REA GESELLSCHAFT FÜR RECYCLING VON ENERGIE UND ABFALL MBH Rottmannstrasse 18 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kübler, Hans Clemensstrasse 47 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 02 /
Muck, Ottokarl Rumfordstrasse 2 D-8000 München 5 / DE | 03 /
Schmid, Martin, Dr. Westermühlstrasse 23 D-8000 München 5 / DE | 04 /
Schnell, Roland Möckernstrasse 71 D-1000 Berlin 61 / DE | 05 /
Wild, Matthias Holzstrasse 4 D-8000 München 5 / DE | 06 /
Wiljan, Harry Hans-Sachs-Strasse 8 D-8000 München 5 / DE | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105567.7 | 07.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | DE19873711813 | 08.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3711813 | [1988/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286100 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0286100 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P5/02 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
C12P5/023 (EP);
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M45/06 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Aufbereitung und anaeroben Vergärung biogen-organischer Abfälle | [1991/42] | English: | Process and plant for the treatment and anaerobic digestion of biogenic wastes | [1991/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de traitement et digestion anaérobique de matières biogéniques | [1991/42] |
Former [1988/41] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu Aufbereitung und anaeroben Vergärung biogen-organischer Abfälle | ||
Former [1988/41] | Process and plant for the treatment and anaerobic conversion of organic waste | ||
Former [1988/41] | Procédé et dispositif de traitement et digestion anaérobie de matières organiques | Examination procedure | 01.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 04.05.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.07.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 24.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57022692 ; | [AD]DE3015239 (WEISS GEB KG [DE]); | [A]EP0126722 (BIOSYSTEM E AB [SE]); | [AD]EP0037612 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 90 (C-104)[968], 27. Mai 1982; & JP-A-57 022 692 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 05-02-1982, & JP57022692 A 00000000 | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY & BIOENGINEERING, Band 27, Nr. 3, März 1985, Seiten 334-344, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., New York, US; S.G. PAVLOSTATHIS et al.: "Alkaline treatment of wheat straw for increasing anaerobic biodegradability" |