EP0286109 - Luminous advertising display element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1990 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.1990 [1990/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WERBELICHT KG, RUDOLF JEROMA Heinz-Kerneck-Strasse 3 D-2800 Bremen / DE | [1988/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeroma, Rudolf c/o Werbelicht KG Rudolf Jeroma Heinz-Kerneck Str. 3 D-2800 Bremen / DE | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105589.1 | 08.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | DE19870005256U | 08.04.1987 Original published format: DE 8705256 U | [1988/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0286109 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0286109 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/04 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
G09F13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Lichtwerbeelement | [1988/41] | English: | Luminous advertising display element | [1988/41] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage lumineux | [1988/41] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.04.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3771245 ; | [Y]US3680238 ; | [Y]US1735040 ; | [Y]US4564886 ; | [A]DE2406988 ; | [A]AT296429B ; | [A]DE2910146 ; | [A]DE8209696U ; | [A]EP0072949 |