blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0300135

EP0300135 - Method for manufacturing a plaster false floor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1989/04]Mould element for the installation of false floors
[1992/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.1993
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.1993 [1993/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G + H MONTAGE GmbH
Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/04]For all designated states
G + H MONTAGE GMBH
Bürgermeister Grünzweig-Strasse 1
D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / von der Linde, Jürgen, Dr.
Wielandststrasse 20
D-6900 Heidelberg-Neuenheim / DE
[1989/04]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1989/04]Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date88105627.908.04.1988
[1989/04]
Priority number, dateDE1987372259908.07.1987         Original published format: DE 3722599
[1989/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0300135
Date:25.01.1989
Language:DE
[1989/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0300135
Date:14.02.1990
Language:DE
[1990/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0300135
Date:10.06.1992
Language:DE
[1992/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.1989
ClassificationIPC:E04F15/024
[1989/04]
CPC:
E04F15/02405 (EP); E04B5/48 (EP); E04F2203/023 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   FR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1989/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Estrichhohlbodens[1992/24]
English:Method for manufacturing a plaster false floor[1992/24]
French:Procédé pour confectionner une chape sur un plancher surélevé[1992/24]
Former [1989/04]Schalungselement für die Verlegung von Hohlböden
Former [1989/04]Mould element for the installation of false floors
Former [1989/04]Elément de coffrage pour l'installation d'un plancher surélevé
Examination procedure22.06.1990Examination requested  [1990/33]
12.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.12.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.1992Fee for grant paid
10.02.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.03.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2036518  ;
 [YD]EP0133556  ;
 [X]DE6912292U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.