EP0322500 - Pipe clamp with joining pipe for sprinkler nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vieregge, Uwe Kantstrasse 10 63584 Gründau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states Vieregge, Uwe Kantstrasse 10 D-63584 Gründau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Industriestrasse 27 63674 Altenstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas Dipl.-Ing., et al Industriestrasse 27 D-63674 Altenstadt / DE | ||
Former [1989/27] | Munderich, Paul, Dipl.-Ing. Frankfurter Strasse 84 D-63584 Gründau / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105679.0 | 09.04.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | DE19873744065 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3744065 | DE19883810777 | 30.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3810777 | [1989/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322500 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322500 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/06 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
F16L41/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/45] |
Former [1989/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Rohrschelle mit Anschlussrohr für eine Sprinklerdüse | [1989/27] | English: | Pipe clamp with joining pipe for sprinkler nozzle | [1989/27] | French: | Bride pour tuyaux avec un tuyau de raccordement pour une tuyère de sprinkler | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, ES, GR, LU, SE | 04.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 22.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.04.1989 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1989 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1989 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1989 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1991 | 04.05.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2443353 [ ] (POLVA NEDERLAND BV); | DE2260929 [ ] (GLYNWED SCREWS & FASTENINGS LT); | DE601874 [ ] (GUSSSTAHLWERK WITTMANN A G); | CH555506 [ ] (HABEGGER EDI); | GB2018379 [ ] (WAVIN BV); | US3999785 [ ] (BLAKELEY JAMES) |