EP0287046 - Pipe and hose separation coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1990 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHWELM ANLAGEN + APPARATE GMBH Loher Strasse 1 D-58332 Schwelm / DE | [1988/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riché, Robert Sendentaler Strasse 22 D-4006 Erkrath / DE | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1988/42] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105836.6 | 13.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | DE19873712884 | 15.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3712884 | [1988/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287046 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287046 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/28 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
B67D9/00 (EP);
F16L37/00 (EP);
F16L37/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/42] | Title | German: | Trennkupplung für Rohr- und Schlauchleitungen | [1988/42] | English: | Pipe and hose separation coupling | [1988/42] | French: | Raccord de séparation pour conduits de tuyaux et de tubes | [1988/42] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/38] | 20.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2717135 ; | [A]DE1131472 ; | [A]GB2081832 ; | [AD]GB2162270 ; | [AD]DE3221372 |