blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0287069

EP0287069 - Connection device for two tubes having the same diameter, the axes of which form an obtuse angle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.1991
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.02.1992 [1992/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/42]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pönisch, Heinz
Hirtenweg 6
D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE
[1988/42]
Application number, filing date88105887.913.04.1988
[1988/42]
Priority number, dateDE19870005530U14.04.1987         Original published format: DE 8705530 U
[1988/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0287069
Date:19.10.1988
Language:DE
[1988/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0287069
Date:27.02.1991
Language:DE
[1991/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.1988
ClassificationIPC:F16B7/04, H02B1/015, F16C11/10
[1991/09]
CPC:
H02B1/01 (EP); F16B7/04 (EP); F16C11/10 (EP)
Former IPC [1988/42]F16B7/04, H02B1/02, F16C11/10
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1988/42]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Verbindung zweier Rohre gleichen Durchmessers, deren Mittelachsen einen stumpfen Winkel einschliessen[1988/42]
English:Connection device for two tubes having the same diameter, the axes of which form an obtuse angle[1988/42]
French:Dispositif de raccordement de deux tubes de même diamètre dont les axes forment un angle obtus entre eux[1988/42]
Examination procedure10.04.1989Examination requested  [1989/24]
06.09.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.08.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.1990Fee for grant paid
04.09.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.11.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4150907  (THURNAUER WILLIAM [US]);
 [A]CH282173  (COMTE JACQUES [CH]);
 [A]FR2330278  (MAYMONT PAUL [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.