EP0287101 - Disk clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No.41, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No.41, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurihara, Toshihiko Pioneer Electronic Corporation Tokorozawa Works No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Funabashi, Tadashi Pioneer Electronic Corporation Tokorozawa Works No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama / JP | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/42] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105988.5 | 14.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | JP19870092031 | 16.04.1987 Original published format: JP 9203187 | [1988/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287101 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287101 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287101 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/028, G11B17/02 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
G11B17/0284 (EP,US);
G11B17/0281 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/42] | G11B17/028 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1988/42] | Title | German: | Plattenklemmvorrichtung | [1988/42] | English: | Disk clamping device | [1988/42] | French: | Dispositif de serrage de disque | [1988/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 10, no. 119, May 6, 1986 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 146 P 453 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 11, no. 112, April 9, 1987 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 142 P 565 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 11, no. 87, March 17, 1987 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 5 P 557 |