EP0288835 - Magnet system for a nuclear spin tomography installation with superconducting single coils and a radiation shield [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmettow, Dieter, Dr. Ludwig-Sand-Strasse 3 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Ries, Günter, Dr. Schobertweg 2 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1988/44] | Application number, filing date | 88105998.4 | 14.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | DE19873714017 | 27.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3714017 | [1988/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0288835 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288835 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/38, G01R33/42, H01F7/22 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
G01R33/3815 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/44] | G01N24/02, G01N24/06, H01F7/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/44] | Title | German: | Magnetsystem einer Anlage zur Kernspintomographie mit supraleitenden Einzelspulen und einem Kälteschild | [1988/44] | English: | Magnet system for a nuclear spin tomography installation with superconducting single coils and a radiation shield | [1988/44] | French: | Dispositif magnétique pour la tomographie de spin nucléaire comportant des bobines supraconductrices isolées et un écran thermique | [1988/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.04.1990 | NL | 01.11.1990 | DE | 01.01.1991 | [2008/02] |
Former [1991/40] | NL | 01.11.1990 | |
DE | 01.01.1991 | ||
Former [1991/33] | NL | 01.11.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0156239 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US4291541 (KNEIP JR GEORGE D, et al); | [A]DE1212626 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]DE1763771 (SIEMENS AG); | [AD]DE3344047 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) | [A] - CRYOGENICS, Band 24, Nr. 2, Februar 1984, Seiten 59-62, Butterworth & Co. (Publishers) Ltd, Guildford, Surrey, GB; K. PIETERMAN et al.: "A 1.5 T superconducting magnet with closed cooling system for spin-imaging: an outline" | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, Band 25, Nr. 6, Juni 1986, Seiten L443-L445, Tokyo, JP; A. YAMAMOTO et al.: "Quench characteristics and operational stability of the TOPAZ thin superconducting solenoid" |