Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
15.08.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] |
26.06.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] |
26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] |
17.02.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.04.1990 [1990/14] |
26.07.1989 | First examination report | |
14.12.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] |
17.09.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] |