Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3860075D1 | 10.05.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3860075 | 14.04.1988 | DE3714017 | 27.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0288835 | Global Dossier | 04.04.1990 | B1 | EP0288835 | 02.11.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3714017 | 27.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3714017 | 17.11.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3714017 | 27.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63304608 | 12.12.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3714017 | 27.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4833433 | 23.05.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3714017 | 27.04.1987 |