EP0295384 - Process for reducing the agglomeration-tendency of particle-shaped active oxygen compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruhs, Alexander, Dr. Untere Kanalstrasse 3 D-7888 Rheinfelden / DE | [1988/51] | Application number, filing date | 88106109.7 | 16.04.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | DE19873720277 | 19.06.1987 Original published format: DE 3720277 | [1988/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295384 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295384 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/04, C01B15/055, B01J2/30 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
B01J2/30 (EP,US);
C01B15/005 (EP,US);
C01B15/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderung der Neigung zum Zusammenbacken von teilchenförmigen Aktivsauerstoffverbindungen | [1988/51] | English: | Process for reducing the agglomeration-tendency of particle-shaped active oxygen compounds | [1988/51] | French: | Procédé pour diminuer la tendance à l'agglomération de composés oxygénés actifs sous forme de particules | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 24.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP60042206 [ ]; | DE2534390 [ ] (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | EP0103416 [ ] | [ ] - Derwent Accession Nr. 85-095250 Questel Telesystemes (WPIL) Derwent Publications Ltd., London *Abstract* & JP-A-60-042 206 (Nippon Peroxide KK), & JP60042206 A 00000000 |