EP0338112 - Procedure and device for guiding and driving a belt drive loaded by forces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1993 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Storck, Karlheinz, Dr. Waldstrasse 84 D-6109 Mühltal 2 / DE | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Dallhammer, Herbert Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Dallhammer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 88106487.7 | 22.04.1988 | [1989/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0338112 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338112 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0338112 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/02, B65G39/073 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
F16H57/04 (EP,US);
B65G39/073 (EP,US);
F16H55/38 (EP,US);
G01M17/0074 (EP,US);
G01M17/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/50] |
Former [1989/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Führung und zum Antrieb eines von Kräften beaufschlagten Bandantriebs | [1989/43] | English: | Procedure and device for guiding and driving a belt drive loaded by forces | [1989/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le guidage et l'entraînement d'un entraînement de bande chargé par des forces | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/43] | 23.04.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, ES, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE | 20.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.1991
19.11.1991
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.1991
19.11.1991
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co.KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | 03.07.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.08.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.09.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.01.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.07.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.05.1989 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.1989 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.1989 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.1989 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.1989 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.1989 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU1104078 [ ]; | [A]DE613827 (ADLER & HENTZEN); | [A]US2628709 (STEINMETZ WALTER C); | [A]US3545582 (KIMMEN EDWARD); | [A]DE3007362 (MTS SYSTEM CORP); | [A]GB2161243 (PUSKAR HALIL); | [A]US4622848 (DOI TERUMASA [JP]) | [ ] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED Sektion Mechanik,Woche 8508, abstrakt nr. 049187, 3. april 1985; & SU - A - 1 104 078 (KUZNIUI COAL) 23.07.1984, & SU1104078 A 00000000 | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED |