EP0288074 - Optical system for flying spot scanning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakimoto, Zenji c/o Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co, Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto, 602 / JP | 02 /
Nagata, Shinichi c/o Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co, Ltd 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto, 602 / JP | 03 /
Katsuyama, Mikizo c/o Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co, Lt 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto, 602 / JP | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88106491.9 | 22.04.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | JP19870102836 | 24.04.1987 Original published format: JP 10283687 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0288074 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0288074 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288074 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/12 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
H04N1/1135 (EP,US);
G02B27/0031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/43] | Title | German: | Optisches System für ein Lichtpunktabtastgerät | [1988/43] | English: | Optical system for flying spot scanning apparatus | [1988/43] | French: | Système optique pour un appareil d'analyse à spot mobile | [1988/43] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.11.1995 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 15.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4279472 (STREET GRAHAM S B); | [A]EP0093583 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US4201455 (BALAZS KAROLY [HU], et al) | [A] - FUJITSU-SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL JOURNAL. vol. 14, no. 3, September 1978, KAWASAKI JP pages 91 - 106; Abe and Matsuda: "The correction method of beam scanning distortion using the parabolic mirror" |