EP0290845 - Record carrier printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/46] | Record carrier printing device | ||
[1993/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. Ancker Jorgensen A/S Ankervej 1 4800 Nykobing F / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states R. Ancker Jorgensen A/S Ankervej 1 DK-4800 Nykobing F / DK | ||
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states UNIPRINT A/S Trekanten DK-6500 Vojens / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bekker-Madsen, Per Hammelen Bygade 46 DK-6500 Vojens / DK | 02 /
Christensen, Otto Hansen Industrieparken 11 DK-6500 Vojens / DK | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Müller, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 D-74074 Heilbronn / DE | ||
Former [1988/46] | Hach, Hans Karl, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach, Lerchenstrasse 56 D-74074 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 88106548.6 | 23.04.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | DE19873715523 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3715523 | [1988/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0290845 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0290845 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290845 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/325 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
B41J17/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/46] | B41J3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bedrucken eines Aufzeichnunsträgers | [1993/33] | English: | Record carrier printing method | [1993/33] | French: | Procédé d'impression sur porteur d'informations | [1993/33] |
Former [1988/46] | Vorrichtung zum Bedrucken eines Aufzeichnunsträgers | ||
Former [1988/46] | Record carrier printing device | ||
Former [1988/46] | Dispositif d'impression sur porteur d'informations | Examination procedure | 07.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 13.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.08.1993 | ES | 18.08.1993 | FR | 18.08.1993 | GB | 18.08.1993 | GR | 18.08.1993 | IT | 18.08.1993 | NL | 18.08.1993 | SE | 18.08.1993 | AT | 23.04.1994 | CH | 30.04.1994 | LI | 30.04.1994 | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 18.08.1993 | |
ES | 18.08.1993 | ||
GB | 18.08.1993 | ||
GR | 18.08.1993 | ||
IT | 18.08.1993 | ||
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
SE | 18.08.1993 | ||
FR | 14.01.1994 | ||
AT | 23.04.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 18.08.1993 | |
GB | 18.08.1993 | ||
GR | 18.08.1993 | ||
IT | 18.08.1993 | ||
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
SE | 18.08.1993 | ||
FR | 14.01.1994 | ||
AT | 23.04.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 18.08.1993 | |
GB | 18.08.1993 | ||
IT | 18.08.1993 | ||
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
SE | 18.08.1993 | ||
FR | 14.01.1994 | ||
AT | 23.04.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/40] | BE | 18.08.1993 | |
GB | 18.08.1993 | ||
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
SE | 18.08.1993 | ||
FR | 14.01.1994 | ||
AT | 23.04.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | BE | 18.08.1993 | |
GB | 18.08.1993 | ||
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
SE | 18.08.1993 | ||
FR | 14.01.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | BE | 18.08.1993 | |
GB | 18.08.1993 | ||
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
SE | 18.08.1993 | ||
FR | 14.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/41] | BE | 18.08.1993 | |
GB | 18.08.1993 | ||
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
SE | 18.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | BE | 18.08.1993 | |
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
SE | 18.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | SE | 18.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2102740 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]EP0114975 (IBM [US]); | [A]DE3510260 (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG [DE]) |