EP0289909 - All aqueous formulations of organo-phosphorous pesticides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1993 [1993/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 9 Campus Drive Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [1991/11] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states BASF Corporation 9 Campus Drive Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mente, Donald Charles 8759 Parkway Grosse Ile Michigan 48138 / US | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Michaelis, Wolfgang, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | Michaelis, Wolfgang, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1988/45] | Wurzler, Hartmut, Dr. i.Fa. BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88106628.6 | 26.04.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | US19870047035 | 05.05.1987 Original published format: US 47035 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289909 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289909 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289909 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/04, A01N57/16, A01N57/14, A01N57/12, // (A01N57/16, 57:14, 57:12, 47:28),(A01N57/14, 57:12, 47:28),(A01N57/12, 47:28) | [1988/45] | CPC: |
A01N25/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/45] | Title | German: | Gänzlich wässerige Formulierungen von Organophosphorpestiziden | [1988/45] | English: | All aqueous formulations of organo-phosphorous pesticides | [1988/45] | French: | Formulations entièrement aqueuses de pesticides organo-phosphorique | [1988/45] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3867533 (SCHMOLKA IRVING R); | [A]GB1516653 (WEST LABORATORIES INC); | [AD]US4195083 (EMBY GORDON N [ZA], et al) |