EP0301178 - Lift control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Joris, Dr. Schädrütihalde 2 CH-6006 Luzern / CH | [1989/05] | Application number, filing date | 88106720.1 | 27.04.1988 | [1989/05] | Priority number, date | CH19870002663 | 13.07.1987 Original published format: CH 266387 | [1989/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0301178 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0301178 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/14, B66B1/46 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
B66B1/462 (EP,US);
B66B1/2458 (EP,US);
B66B1/468 (EP,US);
B66B2201/103 (EP,US);
B66B2201/302 (EP,US);
B66B2201/306 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/05] | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtung für eine Aufzugsanlage | [1989/05] | English: | Lift control device | [1989/05] | French: | Système de commande d'ascenseur | [1989/05] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 18.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3493922 (LAAS ILMAR ERVIN); | [A]EP0132405 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0134892 (INVENTIO AG [CH]); | [A]EP0177741 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) |