EP0290884 - Fine proof bond beam column for reinforced concrete constructions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARBED S.A. Avenue de la Liberté 19 L-2930 Luxembourg / LU | [1988/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schleich, Jean-Baptiste 3, rue Mathias Weistroffer L-1898 Kockelscheuer / LU | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Freylinger, Ernest T., et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Freylinger, Ernest T., et al Office de Brevets Ernest T. Freylinger 321, route d'Arlon Boîte Postale 48 L-8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [1992/19] | Freylinger, Ernest T. Office de Brevets Ernest T. Freylinger, 321, route d'Arlon, Boite Postale 48 L-8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [1989/21] | Freylinger, Ernest T. Office de Brevets Ernest T. Freylinger 321, route d'Arlon Boîte Postale 48 L-8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [1988/46] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 88106889.4 | 29.04.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | LU19870086878 | 14.05.1987 Original published format: LU 86878 | [1988/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0290884 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0290884 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290884 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/29 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
E04B5/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Feuerfester Verband Biegeträger-Stütze für den Stahlbetonbau | [1988/46] | English: | Fine proof bond beam column for reinforced concrete constructions | [1988/46] | French: | Liaison poutre-poteau résistante au feu pour la construction en béton-armé | [1988/46] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.09.1992 | SE | 02.09.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 02.09.1992 | |
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | SE | 02.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1056347 ; | [A]GB784383 (CROMPTON PARKINSON LTD); | [A]CA886291 (DOMINION BRIDGE CO LTD); | [A]LU67658 ; | [A]FR2375402 (DROGE GEORG [DE]); | [A]US4107893 (RENSCH EBERHARD G); | [YD]LU85753 (ARBED [LU]); | [AP]GB2184759 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD) | [X] - BETONWERK UND FERTIGTEIL-TECHNIK, Band 51, Nr. 9, September 1985, Seiten 506-511, Wiesbaden, DE; H. MUESS: "Neue Verbundfertigteile" |