EP0290929 - Automatic sterilizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | Revocation of patent | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Childress, Bobby-Belton 145 Shadow Lane Charlotte, N.C. 28214 / US | [1988/46] | Application number, filing date | 88107094.0 | 03.05.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | US19870050584 | 15.05.1987 Original published format: US 50584 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0290929 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0290929 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290929 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/24 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
A61L2/24 (EP,US);
A61L2/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Automatischer Sterilisierapparat | [1988/46] | English: | Automatic sterilizer | [1988/46] | French: | Stérilisateur automatique | [1988/46] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 23.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.1995
22.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE MELAGAPPARATE GmbH & Co.KG Geneststr. 9-10 D-10829 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski, Michael, et al, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.1995
22.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE MELAGAPPARATE GmbH & Co.KG Geneststr. 9-10 D-10829 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski, Michael, et al, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | 11.01.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.05.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.05.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 15.07.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.10.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.05.1996 | SE | 04.05.1996 | [1997/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4164538 (HALLECK FRANK E [US], et al); | [A]EP0028542 (AMERICAN STERILIZER CO [US]); | [A]EP0177123 (AMERICAN STERILIZER CO [US]); | [A]EP0177119 (AMERICAN STERILIZER CO [US]) |