EP0294590 - Compensation principle current sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vacuumschmelze GmbH Grüner Weg 37 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH Grüner Weg 37 Postfach 2253 D-63412 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nilius, Hans-Joachim Leipziger Strasse 29 D-6453 Seligenstadt / DE | 02 /
Hinz, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys. Akazienweg 5a D-8755 Alzenau / DE | [1988/50] | Application number, filing date | 88107213.6 | 05.05.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | DE19873718857 | 05.06.1987 Original published format: DE 3718857 | [1988/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294590 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294590 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294590 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/02, G01R19/20 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
G01R15/185 (EP);
G01R19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/50] | Title | German: | Stromsensor nach dem Kompensationsprinzip | [1988/50] | English: | Compensation principle current sensor | [1988/50] | French: | Capteur de courant selon le principe de la compensation | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0132745 (TRANSFORMATOREN & ROENTGENWERK [DD]); | [A]DE3241018 (VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4536706 (KEMPER KYRAN B [US]); | [A]US4309655 (LIENHARD HEINZ, et al) | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEE 4th CONFERENCE ON AC AND DC POWER TRANSMISSION, London, 23.-26. September 1985, Seiten 229-234; J. LISSER et al.: "Zero-flux current transformer for wide-band precision measurement in AC and DC HV systems" |