EP0290018 - Reagent pack and carousel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jordan, Willie Walter 2609 Brookcrest Garland Texas 75040 / US | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107225.0 | 05.05.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | US19870047737 | 08.05.1987 Original published format: US 47737 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0290018 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0290018 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N35/02 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
B01L3/508 (EP,US);
A61B5/06 (KR);
G01N35/02 (KR);
Y10S436/809 (EP,US);
Y10T436/111666 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/45] | G01N35/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/45] | Title | German: | Reagenspackung und Karussell | [1988/45] | English: | Reagent pack and carousel | [1988/45] | French: | Enveloppement pour réactifs et carrousel | [1988/45] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/25] | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2107510 (TECHNICON INSTR); | [A]US3713985 (ASTLE T); | [A]US3785773 (ROHRBAUGH D); | [A]US4287155 (TERSTEEG GLENN E, et al); | [A]EP0192968 (ALLIED CORP [US]); | [A]EP0217000 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) |