EP0295413 - Mechanical probe for the optical measurement of electrical potentials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sölkner, Gerald, Dipl.-Ing. Naupliaallee 12 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | [1988/51] | Application number, filing date | 88107233.4 | 05.05.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | DE19873719204 | 09.06.1987 Original published format: DE 3719204 | [1988/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295413 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295413 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/067, G01R31/28, G02F1/03 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
G01R31/308 (EP,US);
G01R1/071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/51] | Title | German: | Mechanische Sonde zur optischen Messung elektrischer Potentiale | [1988/51] | English: | Mechanical probe for the optical measurement of electrical potentials | [1988/51] | French: | Sonde mécanique pour la mesure optique de potentiels électriques | [1988/51] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 09.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4618819 (MOUROU GERARD [US], et al) | [ ] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, Band 22, Nr. 17, 14. August 1986, Seiten 918-919; J. NEES et al.: "Noncontact electro-optic sampling with a GaAs injection laser" | [ ] - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, Band 87-1, Nr. 1, Frühjahr 1987, Seiten 181-182, Philadelphia, PA, US; J.A. VALDMANIS et al.: "A non-contrat electro-optic prober for high speed integrated circuits" | [ ] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, Band QE-22, Nr. 1, Januar 1986, Seiten 69-78, IEEE; J.A. VALDMANIS et al.: "Subpicosecond electrooptic sampling: principles and applications" |