EP0293625 - Conveyor for cuttings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Hennig GmbH Dorfstrasse 41 85737 Ismaning / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states Gebr. Hennig GmbH Dorfstrasse 41 D-85737 Ismaning / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stöhr, Albert Am Wiegenberg 8 D-8015 Markt / DE | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107250.8 | 05.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | DE19873718321 | 01.06.1987 Original published format: DE 3718321 | DE19873735402 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3735402 | [1988/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293625 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293625 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293625 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/06 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
B65G17/067 (EP,US);
B65G2201/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/49] | Title | German: | Späneförderer | [1988/49] | English: | Conveyor for cuttings | [1988/49] | French: | Convoyeur pour copeaux | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3866743 (JORGENSEN CHARLES T); | [X]US2416634 (MCBRIDE JESSE E); | [X]US1432076 ; | [Y]US1804423 (KRENZKE PAUL F); | [Y]FR2351246 (HENNION SA [FR]); | [A]DE2912789 (WILKES KURT) | Examination | DE2223813 |