EP0292777 - Method for manufacture of a ceramic coated metallic component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/48] | Method for manufacture of a cerimac coated metallic component | ||
[1990/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERATOM Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [1988/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yarahmadi, Mohamed, Dr. Eichhornstrasse 18 D-6400 Fulda / DE | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/05] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/48] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107493.4 | 09.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | DE19873717152 | 21.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3717152 | [1988/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292777 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292777 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B22D19/00, C23C28/00, F01N7/16, F02B77/02 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
F01N13/16 (EP,US);
B22D19/00 (EP,US);
C23C28/00 (EP,US);
F02B77/02 (EP,US);
F05C2201/043 (EP,US);
F05C2203/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines keramikbeschichteten metallischen Bauteils | [1988/48] | English: | Method for manufacture of a ceramic coated metallic component | [1990/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément métallique revêtu de céramique | [1988/48] |
Former [1988/48] | Method for manufacture of a cerimac coated metallic component | Examination procedure | 21.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 21.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.08.1990 | ES | 16.08.1990 | FR | 16.08.1990 | GB | 16.08.1990 | IT | 16.08.1990 | NL | 16.08.1990 | SE | 16.08.1990 | AT | 09.05.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 16.08.1990 | |
ES | 16.08.1990 | ||
GB | 16.08.1990 | ||
IT | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
SE | 16.08.1990 | ||
FR | 04.01.1991 | ||
AT | 09.05.1991 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 16.08.1990 | |
GB | 16.08.1990 | ||
IT | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
SE | 16.08.1990 | ||
FR | 04.01.1991 | ||
AT | 09.05.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 16.08.1990 | |
GB | 16.08.1990 | ||
IT | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
FR | 04.01.1991 | ||
AT | 09.05.1991 | ||
Former [1992/46] | BE | 16.08.1990 | |
GB | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
FR | 04.01.1991 | ||
AT | 09.05.1991 | ||
Former [1991/49] | BE | 16.08.1990 | |
GB | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
FR | 04.01.1991 | ||
Former [1991/41] | BE | 16.08.1990 | |
GB | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | BE | 16.08.1990 | |
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | NL | 16.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6179818 ; | [A]JP59108848 ; | [A]JP5985866 ; | [A]FR928322 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]US2763919 (KEMPE ROBERT A, et al); | [A]US4376374 (BOTHWELL BRUCE E [CH]); | [A]US4546048 (GUENTHER WILLIAM D [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 253 (M-512)[2309], 29. August 1986; & JP-A-61 79 818 (HINO MOTORS LTD) 23-04-1986, & JP6179818 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 227 (M-332)[1664], 18. Oktober 1984; & JP-A-59 108 848 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) 23-06-1984, & JP59108848 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 193 (C-241), 5. September 1984, Seite 87 C 241; & JP-A-59 85 866 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 17-05-1984, & JP5985866 A 00000000 |