EP0291055 - Stable creatinamidinohydrolase mutants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | [1989/11] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH Sandhofer Strasse 112-132 D-6800 Mannheim-Waldhof / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumacher, Günther, Dr. rer. nat. Kapellenweg 20 D-8139 Bernried / DE | 02 /
Buckel, Peter, Dr. rer. nat. Eichenstrasse 19 D-8139 Bernried / DE | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107636.8 | 11.05.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | DE19873715841 | 12.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3715841 | DE19883803175 | 03.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803175 | [1988/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291055 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291055 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291055 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/57, C12N9/78, C12N1/20, C12Q1/34, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:19) | [1993/37] | CPC: |
C12N9/78 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
Y10S435/877 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/46] | C12N15/00, C12N9/78, C12N1/20, C12Q1/34, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:19) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Stabile Creatinamidinohydrolase-Mutanten | [1988/46] | English: | Stable creatinamidinohydrolase mutants | [1988/46] | French: | Mutantes stables de la créatinamidinohydrolase | [1988/46] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 11.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 20.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57036985 ; | [AD]EP0187138 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [AP]DE3707172 (KIKKOMAN CORP [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 106 (C-108)[984], 16. Juni 1982; & JP-A-57 036 985 (TOYO BOSEKI K.K.) 27-02-1982, & JP57036985 A 00000000 | [A] - PROTEINS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTION AND GENETICS, Band 1, Nr. 4, 1986, Seiten 326-334, A.R. LISS, INC., New York, NY, US; P.N. BRYAN et al.: "Proteases of enhanced stability: Characterization of a thermostable variant of subtilisin" |