EP0291891 - Process for applying conversion coatings on titanium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON PARKERIZING CO., LTD. 15-1, 1-Chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states NIHON PARKERIZING CO., LTD. 15-1, 1-Chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Hiroyoshi c/o Nihon Parkerizing Co., Ltd. No.15-1, 1-Chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nishi, Eiichi c/o Nihon Parkerizing Co., Ltd. No.15-1, 1-Chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kanda, Masanori c/o Nihon Parkerizing Co., Ltd. No.15-1, 1-Chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1988/47] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107776.2 | 14.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | JP19870118099 | 16.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11809987 | [1988/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291891 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291891 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/34 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
C23C22/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Konversionsüberzügen auf Titan | [1988/47] | English: | Process for applying conversion coatings on titanium | [1988/47] | French: | Procédé pour appliquer des couches de conversion sur le titane | [1988/47] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3627249 (NIHON PARKERIZING [JP]); | [A]FR1146748 (PARKER STE CONTINENTALE); | [A]GB2059445 (RICHARDSON CHEMICAL CO); | [A]US3041215 (HENRY JENKINS HERBERT ARTHUR, et al) |