EP0291918 - Motor ventilation improvement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETEK, INC. 11111 Santa Monica Boulevard 17th Floor Los Angeles California 90025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states MAGNETEK, INC. 11111 Santa Monica Boulevard 17th Floor Los Angeles California 90025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parkinson, David D. 2844 South 76th Street West Allis, WI 53219 / US | 02 /
Latus, Gilbert T. 3822 South 20th Street Milwaukee, WI 53221 / US | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1988/47] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Postfach 30 24 30 D-20308 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107854.7 | 17.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | US19870053102 | 21.05.1987 Original published format: US 53102 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291918 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291918 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/06 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
H02K9/06 (EP,US);
H02K5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Motorkühlung | [1988/47] | English: | Motor ventilation improvement | [1988/47] | French: | Ventilation d'un moteur | [1988/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/14] | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2074067 (DARNELL VICTOR L); | [A]CH273578 (ELECTRO MECANIQUE DE LAVEYRON [FR]); | [A]US2419156 (PACKER LEWIS C); | [A]DE2236162 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]DE560135 (AEG) |