EP0291943 - State detecting arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishiyama, Haruo 4-10, Nagamodai 10-chome Kamo-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107918.0 | 18.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | JP19870124469 | 21.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12446987 | JP19870124470 | 21.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12447087 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291943 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291943 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291943 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, G03G15/052, G03G15/20, G02B6/42 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
G03G15/65 (EP,US);
G02B6/4202 (EP,US);
G03G15/043 (EP,US);
G03G15/2039 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00371 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00611 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Feststellen eines Zustands | [1988/47] | English: | State detecting arrangement | [1988/47] | French: | Détecteur d'états | [1988/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59036055 ; | [A]JP57034572 ; | [A]JP57194645 ; | [A]JP57173848 ; | [A]JP59089046 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 136 (M-304)[1573], 23rd 1984; & JP-A-59 036 055 (RICOH K.K.) 28-02-1984, & JP59036055 A 00000000 | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 5, October 1981, pages 2593-2595, New York, US; T. TOMASKY et al.: "Fiber-optic transmission system" | [A] - G. ASCH et al.: "Les capteurs en instrumentation industrielle", Nouvelle édition, 1983, pages 216-217, Dunod, Paris, FR | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 104 (P-122)[982], 15th June 1982; & JP-A-57 034 572 (RICOH K.K.) 24-02-1982, & JP57034572 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 45 (E-160)[1190], 23rd February 1983; & JP-A-57 194 645 (RICOH K.K.) 30-11-1982, & JP57194645 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 18 (P-170)[1163], 25th January 1983; & JP-A-57 173 848 (RICOH K.K.) 26-10-1982, & JP57173848 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 200 (E-266)[1637], 13th September 1984; & JP-A-59 089 046 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 23-05-1984, & JP59089046 A 00000000 | Examination | JP5936055 | JPS57194645 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 136 (M-304)[1573], 23rd June 1984; & JP-A-59 36 055, & JP5936055 A 00000000 | - K. Mütze et al: "ABC der Optik", Verlag Werner Dausien, Hanau/Main (1972), p. 644, 645, 676, "Photodiode, -element, -transistor" |