EP0294633 - Carbon ribbon supply apparatus for a printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Sato 15-5, Shibuya 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Sato 15-5, 1-chome, Shibuya Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Hidenori 9-1, Minami, 1-chome, Nimaibashi-cho Hanamaki-shi, Iwate-ken / JP | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/50] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108145.9 | 20.05.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | JP19870088128U | 09.06.1987 Original published format: JP 8812887 U | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294633 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294633 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294633 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J17/24 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
B41J17/24 (EP,KR,US);
B41J33/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/50] | Title | German: | Kohlebandzuführvorrichtung für Drucker | [1988/50] | English: | Carbon ribbon supply apparatus for a printer | [1988/50] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation d'un ruban carbone pour une imprimante | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0176009 (SATO KK [JP]) |