EP0293718 - Substituted aminophenyl carbamate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krüger, Bernd-Wieland, Dr. Sillerstrasse 49 D-5600 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Sasse, Klaus, Dr. Pützweg 13 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 03 /
Heitkämper, Peter, Dr. Fliederweg 14 D-4047 Dormagen 11 / DE | 04 /
König, Klaus, Dr. Zum Hahnenberg 40 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 05 /
Brandes, Wilhelm, Dr. Eichendorffstrasse 3 D-5653 Leichlingen / DE | 06 /
Hänssler, Gerd, Dr. Am Arenzberg 58a D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | 07 /
Marhold, Albrecht, Dr. Carl-Duisberg-Strasse 329 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | [1988/49] | Application number, filing date | 88108239.0 | 24.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | DE19873718522 | 03.06.1987 Original published format: DE 3718522 | DE19883804288 | 12.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3804288 | [1988/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293718 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293718 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293718 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C273/08, C07C275/30, C07D319/06, C07C215/76, C07C205/22, A01N47/22, A01N47/20, A01N47/30 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
C07D307/08 (EP,US);
C07C273/08 (KR);
C07C205/26 (EP,US);
C07C205/37 (EP,US);
C07C275/34 (EP,US);
C07D319/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/49] | C07C125/06, C07C127/19, C07D319/06, C07C91/44, C07C79/26, A01N47/22, A01N47/20, A01N47/30 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/49] | Title | German: | Substituierte Aminophenyl-carbamate | [1988/49] | English: | Substituted aminophenyl carbamate | [1988/49] | French: | Carbamate d'aminophényle substitué | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP62212353 ; | [A]CH616654 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]); | [AD]EP0125901 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [AD]EP0117024 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 108, Nr. 14, 4. April 1988, Columbus, Ohio, USA HARADA,SUKETAKA "Preparation of m-aminophenol derivatives as materials for pharma- ceuticals, and dyes." Seite 701, Spalte 2/1, Zusammenfassung Nr. 131 277 & JP-A-62 212 353, & JP62212353 A 00000000 |