EP0292919 - Semiconductor rod zone melting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Yasuhiro 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-City Gunma / JP | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108273.9 | 24.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | JP19870125804 | 25.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12580487 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292919 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292919 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C30B13/20, H05B6/30 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
H05B6/30 (EP,US);
C30B13/20 (EP,US);
Y10S117/90 (EP,US);
Y10S117/917 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zonenschmelzen eines Halbleiterstabes | [1988/48] | English: | Semiconductor rod zone melting apparatus | [1988/48] | French: | Appareil de fusion en zone d'un barreau semi-conducteur | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 30.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1150697 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US2898430 (ANTOINE BRUEDER) |