EP0306621 - Smear signal perturbations-compensating circuit in satellite television receivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rehak, Manfred GRUNDIG E.M.V. Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-8510 Fürth/Bay. / DE | 02 /
Spörl, Manfred GRUNDIG E.M.V. Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-8510 Fürth/Bay. / DE | [1989/11] | Application number, filing date | 88108392.7 | 26.05.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | DE19873730181 | 09.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3730181 | [1989/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0306621 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0306621 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306621 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/21 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
H04N5/21 (EP);
H04N7/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/11] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Kompensation der durch ein Verwischungssignal hervorgerufenen Störungen in Satelliten-Fernsehempfängern | [1989/11] | English: | Smear signal perturbations-compensating circuit in satellite television receivers | [1989/11] | French: | Circuit de compensation de perturbations par un signal effaceur dans les récepteurs de télévision par satellite | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 19.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEIT- SCHRIFT NTZ, 21. Jahrgang, Heft 3, MÛrz 1968, Berlin LOTHAR FRIEDERICHS "M!glich- keiten zur TrÛgerverwischung bei TV- ̈bertragung Ùber Nachrichtensatelliten" Seiten 129-135 |