EP0292958 - Method for preparing thin film of compound oxide superconductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Itami Research Laboratories, 1-1, Koya-Kita 1-chome Itami, Hyogo 664 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Nobuhiko Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Itozaki, Hideo Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Saburo Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Yazu, Shuji Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Jodai, Tetsuji Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1988/48] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro, Alois-Steineckerstrasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108406.5 | 25.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | JP19870128773 | 26.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12877387 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292958 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292958 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292958 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
H10N60/857 (EP,US);
H10N60/0381 (EP,US);
H10N60/0604 (EP,US);
H10N60/0884 (EP,US);
Y10S505/731 (EP,US);
Y10S505/732 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer dünnen Schicht aus supraleitendem Mischoxid | [1988/48] | English: | Method for preparing thin film of compound oxide superconductor | [1988/48] | French: | Méthode de préparation d'une couche mince en oxyde composite supraconducteur | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]FR2602246 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [E]EP0285132 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [E]EP0288001 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0292387 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) | Examination | EP0282839 |