blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0294658

EP0294658 - Process for treating effluent gas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.1994 [1994/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ota-ku
Tokyo, 144 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/50]For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho
Ota-ku Tokyo, 144 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Maezawa, Akihiko
2153-257, Kamariyamachi Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Nakajima, Yoshio
7-17-8, Okusawa Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Kaneko, Mitsuyoshi
1918, Kanai-cho
Michida-shi Tokyo / JP
04 / Aoki, Shinji
2-36-8-606, Seijyo Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1988/50]
Representative(s)Nöth, Heinz, et al
Patentanwälte
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/05]Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Patentanwälte Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17
D-80336 München / DE
Former [1988/50]Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17
D-8000 München 2 / DE
Application number, filing date88108408.126.05.1988
[1988/50]
Priority number, dateJP1987013606730.05.1987         Original published format: JP 13606787
JP1987030888707.12.1987         Original published format: JP 30888787
[1988/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0294658
Date:14.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0294658
Date:27.01.1993
Language:EN
[1993/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.1988
ClassificationIPC:B01D53/34, B01J19/08
[1988/50]
CPC:
B01D53/007 (EP,US); B01D53/56 (EP,US); B01J19/081 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1988/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Behandlung von Abgasen[1988/50]
English:Process for treating effluent gas[1988/50]
French:Procédé pour traiter des gaz de fumée[1988/50]
Examination procedure16.05.1989Examination requested  [1989/29]
30.04.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.02.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.07.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.1992Fee for grant paid
09.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.10.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AP]DE3622621  (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]);
 [A]DE3608291  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]);
 [A]DE3020301  (EBARA CORP, et al);
 [A]DE2952458  (EBARA CORP, et al);
 [A]FR2213795  (EBARA MFG [JP]);
 [A]US4324759  (AOKI SHINJI, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.