EP0292988 - Method for drying wetted molded product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 2-8, Dosho-machi 2-Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | For all designated states KOKEN CO. LTD. 5-18 Shimoochiai 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 2-8, Dosho-machi 2-Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states KOKEN CO. LTD. 5-18 Shimoochiai 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states KOKEN CO. LTD. 5-18 Shimoochiai 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 40, Dosho-machi 2-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states KOKEN CO. LTD. 5-18 Shimoochiai 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujioka, Keiji No. 206, Famiyu-Tsukaguchi, 27-5 Tsukaguchi-cho 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Shigeji 29-7, Oike 2-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Yoshio No. 106, 11-8, Sone Higashi-machi 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Miyata, Teruo No. 314, 6-29, Shimo-Ochiai 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Furuse, Masayasu 3-8-9, Minamidai Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Naito, Hiromi 90, Miro Street Ohakune / NZ | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108498.2 | 27.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | JP19870136733 | 29.05.1987 Original published format: JP 13673387 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292988 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292988 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292988 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F26B5/16 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
F26B5/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Trocknen von feuchten Formkörpern | [1988/48] | English: | Method for drying wetted molded product | [1988/48] | French: | Méthode de séchage de produits moulés humides | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 17.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU23393 ; | [A]DE2933937 (STETTNER & CO); | [A]DE2948581 (KUNZE CONCEWITZ HORST); | [A]US4383376 (NUMAMOTO YUKIO [JP], et al); | [AD]EP0139286 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4645698 (MATSUBARA MAMORU [JP]); | [AP]US4686776 (MATSUBARA MAMORU [JP]) |