EP0300166 - Cache memory having a resiliency in processing a variety of address faults [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/04] | Cache memory resiliency in processing a variety of address faults | ||
[1995/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. 300 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821-4186 / US | [1995/34] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. Technology Park Billerica, MA 01821-4199 / US | ||
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states Honeywell Bull Inc. 3800 W. 80th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55431 / US | ||
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states Honeywell Bull Inc. 3800 W. 80th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barlow, George J. 19 Easement Road Tewksbury Massachusetts 01876 / US | 02 /
Keeley, James W. 41 Parrish Hill Drive Nashua New Hampshire 03063 / US | 03 /
Nibby, Chester M., Jr. 183 Bridge Street Beverly Massachusetts 01915 / US | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108502.1 | 27.05.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | US19870055577 | 28.05.1987 Original published format: US 55577 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300166 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300166 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300166 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F12/08 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
G06F11/073 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (KR);
G06F11/0724 (EP,US);
G06F11/0793 (EP,US);
G06F12/0815 (EP,US);
G06F11/0757 (EP,US);
G06F11/141 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/04] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Cachespeicher mit einer Elastizität in der Verarbeitung verschiedener Adressenfehler | [1995/35] | English: | Cache memory having a resiliency in processing a variety of address faults | [1995/35] | French: | Antémémoire ayant une résilience au traitement de diverses fautes d'adresse | [1995/35] |
Former [1989/04] | Cache-Speicherprallkraft in der Verarbeitung verschiedener Adressenfehler | ||
Former [1989/04] | Cache memory resiliency in processing a variety of address faults | ||
Former [1989/04] | Antémémoire résiliente au traitement de variétés de fautes d'adresse | Examination procedure | 13.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.05.1996 | [1997/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3979726 (LANGE RONALD EDWIN, et al); | [A]US4562536 (KEELEY JAMES W [US], et al); | [A]EP0176972 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS [US]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, vol. C-30, no. 10, October 1981, pages 715-733, New York, US; D.W. CLARK et al.: "The memory system of a high-performance personal computer" |