EP0293805 - Guide element structure engageable in sliding contact with a magnetic support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bordignon, Abramo Via Palmiro Togliatti, 32 I-20030 Senago Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states Bordignon, Abramo Via Palmiro Togliatti, 32 I-20030 Senago Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88108622.7 | 30.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | IT19870020743 | 01.06.1987 Original published format: IT 2074387 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293805 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293805 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/60 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
G11B23/502 (EP,US);
G11B33/02 (KR);
G11B15/605 (EP,US);
G11B23/08757 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1988/49] | Title | German: | Führungselement welches sich in Gleitkontakt mit einem magnetischen Träger befindet | [1992/30] | English: | Guide element structure engageable in sliding contact with a magnetic support | [1988/49] | French: | Structure d'élément de guidage à mettre en contact glissant avec un support magnétique | [1988/49] |
Former [1988/49] | Führungselement welches sich in Gleitkontakt mit einem magnetischen Träger bedindet | Examination procedure | 19.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2376487 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | FR2419559 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP]); | US4429823 [ ] (UMEHARA YOZABURO [JP]) |